DC B25-0598 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Act A25-0340 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016602, Expires on Mar 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Act A25-0340 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016602, Expires on Mar 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Council | Act A25-0340 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016602, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 |
2023-12-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-12-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0340, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |