DC B25-0723 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0436 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004116, Expires on Jun 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act A25-0436 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004116, Expires on Jun 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Litigation Support Fund Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Litigation Support Fund Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Act A25-0436 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004116, Expires on Jun 27, 2024 |
2024-03-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-03-29 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0436, Expires on Jun 27, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |