DC B25-0739 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-739 would authorize the Mayor to dispose of certain District-owned real property to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.
Title
St. Elizabeths East WMATA Redevelopment Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-09-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-09-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-08-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-08-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0739 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0739 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54935/Introduction/B25-0739-Introduction.pdf |