DC B25-0740 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-740 would require the Office of the State Superintendent of Education to publish monthly data on absenteeism on its website.
Title
Truancy Reduction for Student Success Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-13 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-04-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0740 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0740 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54936/Introduction/B25-0740-Introduction.pdf |