DC B25-0767 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Law L25-0195, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009568, Expires on Mar 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Law L25-0195, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009568, Expires on Mar 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Association Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-02 | Council | Law L25-0195, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009568, Expires on Mar 01, 2025 |
2024-06-07 | Council | Act A25-0483 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006754 |
2024-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-05-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-05-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0483 |
2024-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-02 | Council | First Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |