DC B25-0771 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0446 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004635, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0446 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004635, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0446 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004635, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0446, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |