DC B25-0773 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0447 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004637, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0447 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004637, Expires on Jul 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relief for River East at Grandview Condominium Owners Emergency Act of 2024
Title
Relief for River East at Grandview Condominium Owners Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0447 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004637, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0447, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |