DC B25-0782 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-782 would establish a Work Models Task Force that evaluates competitive work models for District government employees.
FISCAL NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Work Models Task Force Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0782 |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-05-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0782 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2024-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0782 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55135/Introduction/B25-0782-Introduction.pdf |