DC B25-0862 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Law Number L25-0212 Effective from Sep 18, 2024, Expires on May 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Law Number L25-0212 Effective from Sep 18, 2024, Expires on May 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-18 | Council | Law Number L25-0212 Effective from Sep 18, 2024, Expires on May 01, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Council | Act A25-0533 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009942 |
2024-08-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-07-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-07-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0533 |
2024-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-25 | Council | First Reading |
2024-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |