DC B25-0889 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Buzzard Point Park and Trails National Park Service Grant Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Buzzard Point Park and Trails National Park Service Grant Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024 |
2024-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-07-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0889 Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-09 | Council | First Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |