DC B25-0930 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-17 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-17 - Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-930 would require regulated entities to establish and make publicly available, a consumer health data privacy policy governing the collection, use, sharing, and sale of consumer health data with the consumer’s consent. It would establish additional protections and consumer authorizations for the sale of personal health data. It also establishes that regulated entities can only collect health data that is necessary for the purposes disclosed to the consumers and makes violations unfair and deceptive trade practices.
Title
Consumer Health Information Privacy Protection Act (CHIPPA) of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-17 | Council | Public Hearing |
2024-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2024-09-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0930 Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0930 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/56009/Introduction/B25-0930-Introduction.pdf |