DC CER25-0048 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Resolution ACR25-0047, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 006367
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Resolution ACR25-0047, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 006367
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bard High School Early College DC DCIAA and DCSAA Basketball Championship Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2023
Title
Bard High School Early College DC DCIAA and DCSAA Basketball Championship Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0047, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 006367 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0047 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-04-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |