DC PR25-0553 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Resolution R25-0380, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016089
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Resolution R25-0380, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016089
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Second Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Second Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Council | Resolution R25-0380, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016089 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0380 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |