DC PR25-0562 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Resolution R25-0392, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016635
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Resolution R25-0392, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016635
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Second Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Second Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Council | Resolution R25-0392, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016635 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0392 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |