DC PR25-0706 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0483, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0483, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Resolution R25-0483, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004137 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0483 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |