DC PR25-0709 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0481, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Resolution R25-0481, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Annie's Way Designation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Annie's Way Designation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Council | Resolution R25-0481, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004134 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0481 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |