DC PR25-0757 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0498, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0498, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lafayette Elementary School Grass Field Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Lafayette Elementary School Grass Field Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0498, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006134 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0498 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |