DC PR25-0802 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-02 - Roundtable Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-02 - Roundtable Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board Teri Janine Quinn Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board Teri Janine Quinn Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-02 | Council | Roundtable Hearing |
2024-09-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-09-24 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-09-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0802 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0802 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55439/Introduction/PR25-0802-Introduction.pdf |