FL H0529 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain retirement health insurance benefits shall not be available to specified employees.
Title
Lee County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#59 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 648 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 574 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -HJ 818 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 392 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 49 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 49 | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |