FL H0529 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criminal penalties for criminal mischief that causes damage to certain memorials that honor or commemorate soldier, member of military, military organization or unit, first responder, or an astronaut.
Title
Soldiers' and Heroes' Memorials Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died on Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-03-05 | House | Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0418 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice