FL H1209 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from tax certain separately stated charges imposed on lessee or licensee of leased or licensed premises; authorizes businesses that receive tax credits under Urban High-Crime Area Job Tax Credit Program or Rural Job Tax Credit Program to assign or transfer credits to other businesses; provides limitations on use of transferred tax credits; provides requirements for transfer of tax credits; authorizes qualified target industry business to sell, assign, exchange, convey, or otherwise transfer unused tax credits; provides for carryforward of unused qualified target industry business tax credits.
Title
Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1422 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1209 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1209/BillText/Filed/PDF |