FL H8001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee |
2013-09-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0068 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/8001 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/8001/BillText/Filed/PDF |