FL S0210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a driver of any vehicle involved in a crash that results in serious bodily injury to any person to immediately stop the vehicle at the scene of the crash, etc.
Title
Leaving the Scene/Crash/Death or Personal Injuries [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00024 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1029 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0316 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |