FL S0210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a family day care home to conspicuously display its license or registration in the common area of the home, to provide proof of a written plan that identifies a designated substitute for the operator, and to provide proof of screening and background checks for certain individuals; prohibiting certain persons from advertising a child care facility, a family day care home, or a large family child care home without including the facility's or home's license number, registration number, or exemption number in such advertisement; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Licensing of Facilities that Offer Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/05/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0119 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |