FL S0570 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01089; Substituted HB 7243 -SJ 01089; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 01089
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01089; Substituted HB 7243 -SJ 01089; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 01089
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the greenhouse gas reporting requirement for major emitters. Requires all public entities and those entities occupying buildings managed by the DMS to report recycling data to the county using the format designated by the DEP. Provides for the creation of a voluntary recyclers certification program. Revises requirements for review of new waste-to-energy facility capacity by the DEP, etc.
Title
Environmental Protection [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01089; Substituted HB 7243 -SJ 01089; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/CS/SB 550 (Ch. 2010-205), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 01089 | |
2010-04-26 | Pending amendment(s), withdrawn -SJ 00839; Amendment(s) adopted (915602, 891904, 754784, 616154, 335584) -SJ 00840; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00842 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00789; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00789; Amendment(s) adopted (630728) -SJ 00789; Amendment(s) pending -SJ 00791 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- General Government Appropriations (130306); YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-04-16 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-14 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00603 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-22 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00299 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00278; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00282 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/17/10, 3:30 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/09/10, 2:00 pm, 401-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00045; On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S --Workshop-Discussed | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S --Workshop | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1559 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
S1696 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
H7243 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-143; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7179 (Ch. 2010-139), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
S1696 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
H7243 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-143; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7179 (Ch. 2010-139), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0288 | 1185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 9015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |