FL S0570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising definitions; repealing provisions relating to the Electrolysis Council; providing certification requirements for licensed electrologists who perform laser hair removal or reduction, etc.
Title
Laser Hair Removal or Reduction
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H329 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
478 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/570 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/570/BillText/Filed/HTML |