FL S0570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a fee for a certain specialty license plate, etc.
Title
Fees/Guardian Ad Litem License Plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S568 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/570 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/570/BillText/Filed/HTML |