FL S0852 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Smart City Challenge Grant Program within the Department of Transportation; requiring a long-range transportation plan to consider infrastructure and technological improvements necessary to accommodate the increased use of autonomous technology and electric vehicles; amending provisions, beginning in a specified fiscal year, revising the annual allocations in the State Transportation Trust Fund for the Transportation Regional Incentive Program; prohibiting the department from programing certain projects to be funded in the 5-year work program after June 30, 2018, etc.
Title
Transportation Infrastructure
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H633 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H535 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H981 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S384 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1200 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H535 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H981 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S384 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1200 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0899 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |