FL S1542 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting a faith-based institution from the jurisdiction or purview of the Commission for Independent Education; authorizing the commission to retain governmental oversight of a faith-based institution's compliance with fair consumer practices; exempting certain faith-based institutions from complying with fair consumer practices, etc.
Title
Faith-based Institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Education |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1542 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |