FL S1542 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7043 (Ch. 2017-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7043 (Ch. 2017-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting private owners of submerged lands to establish, upon application and approval of the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission, boating-restricted areas in certain seagrass areas to protect seagrasses, etc.
Title
Seagrass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7043 (Ch. 2017-163) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1338 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7043 (Ch. 2017-163)
H7043 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-163
H7043 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-163
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1542 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |