FL S1542 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Corrections to submit an annual report to the Legislature by a specified date which contains specified information regarding prisoners of certain ages who are in the custody of the department; revising the criteria allowing a court to sentence as a youthful offender a person who is found guilty of, or who pled nolo contendere or guilty to, committing a felony before the person turned 21 years of age, etc.
Title
Youthful Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S234 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1229 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H1229 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1542 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |