FL S1542 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 835
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 835
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring state agencies to provide assistance to the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee, upon request; creating the position of Dementia Director within the Department of Elderly Affairs; revising incentive funding criteria for memory disorder clinics; revising the information the department must consider when developing the allocation formula for respite care, etc.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 835 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 835 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H835 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 5015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1542 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |