FL S1542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain coastal counties to use up to a specified percentage of tourist development tax revenue to reimburse tourism training program expenses; revising the percentage of tourist development tax revenue which such counties may use to reimburse public safety services expenses; authorizing certain fiscally constrained counties to use tourist development tax revenue for such purposes without meeting certain criteria, etc.
Title
Tourist Development Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H673 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1542 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |