FL S1542 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-261, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-261, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that information obtained by an elder abuse or vulnerable adult abuse fatality review team which is exempt or confidential and exempt from public records requirements retains its protected status; providing an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of an abuse victim and other specified information contained in records held by a review team; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing statements of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings/Elder Abuse or Vulnerable Adult Abuse Fatality Review Team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#397 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Chapter No. 2023-261, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260) | |
2023-06-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1540 (Related) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-260, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
H1569 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
H1567 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
H1569 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
H1567 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)