HI HB1021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition for "contested case". Amends the deadline to intervene in a proceeding to accept a developer's proposal to thirty days after the first public hearing on a developer's proposal. Requires HCDA to make certain findings on the proposed project and its impacts, including concerns expressed by community residents and stakeholders, in order to approve the proposed development. Requires developers to abide by all representations and commitments made in the permit application process.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Public Hearings; Contested Cases
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB906 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1021&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1021_.HTM |