HI HB1040 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates chapter 329-22, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by adding subsection (e) to make it consistent with amendments in federal controlled substances law as required under section 329-11.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1266 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB1266 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1040&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1040_.HTM |