HI HB1089 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Act 007, 4/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Act 007, 4/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October as "Kalo Appreciation Month". (HB1089 HD1)
Title
Kalo Appreciation Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Act 007, 4/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2013-04-09 | House | Act 007, on 4/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2013-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 402). |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-21-13. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported from THA/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to THA/TEC. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-15 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI, OMH, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |