HI HB1089 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle safety inspections to be conducted every two years rather than annually for vehicles registered in a county with a population of three hundred thousand or less. (HB1089 HD2)
Title
Motor Vehicles; Certificates of Inspection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee on TRA deferred the measure. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to TRA/CPN, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 270). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Onishi, Oshiro, Rhoads, Takayama, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 755) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-15. |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-23-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-18-15 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |