HI HB1089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
With the numbers of threats and incidents against the country which have arisen in the recent past, it is even more crucial that the State of Hawaii, as a strategic location in the Pacific, have all information necessary to guard against those who would do harm to the country and to the state. In the current atmosphere of increased terrorist activities, it is even more important that the Hawaii State Fusion Center be fully staffed and supported. This bill adds the fusion center as a program under the existing Office of Homeland Security and establishes the position of director of the fusion center who shall be responsible to the director of homeland security and accountable to manage the day-to-day operations of the fusion center.
Title
Relating To Homeland Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1089 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB955 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
SB955 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1089&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1089_.HTM |