HI HB1089 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
With the numbers of threats and incidents against the country which have arisen in the recent past, it is even more crucial that the State of Hawaii, as a strategic location in the Pacific, have all information necessary to guard against those who would do harm to the country and to the state. In the current atmosphere of increased terrorist activities, it is even more important that the Hawaii State Fusion Center be fully staffed and supported. This bill adds the fusion center as a program under the existing Office of Homeland Security and establishes the position of director of the fusion center who shall be responsible to the director of homeland security and accountable to manage the day-to-day operations of the fusion center.
Title
Relating To Homeland Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB955 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1089 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1089 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1089&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1089_.HTM |