HI HB1089 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1089
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the DOH to perform a study to develop a pilot program to provide state-provided financial support to individuals pursuing a doctor of medicine degree in exchange for a commitment to practice medicine in Hawaii after they graduate. (HB1089 HD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1089 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.