HI HB1317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows county governments to enter into private-public partnerships for the services and transferring, or joint venturing of one or more of their wastewater treatment facilities to a private entity, or its wholly owned nonprofit management entity, for the delivery of those services.
Title
Relating To Environmental Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-21. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB997 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1317 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1317 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1317&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1317_.HTM |