HI HB1469 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state income tax deduction for eligible contributions made to the Hawaii college savings program. Applies to taxable years after 12/31/2019. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The College Savings Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-19-19 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 494). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.