HI HB1471 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Agriculture to facilitate land-based aquaculture farming on lands exceeding three acres in area and classified as agricultural. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1471 HD1).
Title
DOA; Aquaculture
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cheape voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, Takayama. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Wednesday, 02-13-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |