HI HB1511 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1511
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies license, relicense, certification, and recertification fees for community-based licensed care homes and facilities and case managers under the Department of Health. Stipulates that the fees be deposited into the general fund.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1511 (Carry Over) 2017-01-31 - Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Case Managers
Certification
Department of Health Community-based Licensed Care Homes
Fees
License
Recertification
Relicense
Certification
Department of Health Community-based Licensed Care Homes
Fees
License
Recertification
Relicense
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1511&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1511_.HTM |