HI HB1511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1511
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Community-Based Economic Development Advisory Council to retain and oversee professional research and analysis services for the evaluation of the means for or barriers to private for-profit start-up agricultural businesses to acquire funds for agriculture infrastructure projects. (HB1511 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Community-based Economic Development Advisory Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi, Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1511 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).