HI HB1579 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of elections to join the Electronic Registration Information Center and share information with counties to encourage voter participation and ensure integrity of voter registration rolls. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Voter Registration; Verification ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2444 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1579&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1579_.HTM |