HI HB1639 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that at least ten per cent of funds appropriated for school repair and maintenance be set aside and used to fund the repair, maintenance, and upgrading of school facilities to meet green building standards.
Title
School Repair and Maintenance; Environment; Green building
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-01-11 8:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1639 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1639_.HTM |