HI HB1639 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a state carbon emissions tax of $6.25 per ton of carbon dioxide equivalent emissions on all aviation fuel. Directs the aviation fuel tax into the airport revenue fund. Implements a tax credit to mitigate the effects of this tax on lower income taxpayers.
Title
Relating To A Carbon Tax On Aviation Fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2007 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1639&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1639_.HTM |