HI HB1650 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DPS to prepare preliminary design and request for proposals for the design, development, and operation of a correctional treatment facility and to consider the undeveloped portion on the existing Halawa correctional facility as a possible site for the facility. Appropriates funds.
Title
Correctional Facilities Development Study; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-17-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1529 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - (S) Referred to PGM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1650 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1650_.HTM |